Accounts and annual returns SAFETY NET

Charity Number: 297331
Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 April 2023 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 August 2022 196 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 August 2022 561 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required