Financial history THE ASHBURTON COMMUNITY SCHOOL (CROYDON) DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity Number: 297333
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011
Total gross income £250 £11.58k £0 £0 £47.40k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £2.00k £0 £5.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A