BRIGHTON HEART SUPPORT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Aims of the charity are to assist in the care of patients with cardiac related problems both in hospital and in the community. we do this by support the purchase of equipment, promoting and funding community resuscitation and training, supporting phase IV cardiac rehabilitation, providing information. supporting training of cardias staff
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
Governance
- 27 July 1987: Standard registration
- 13 October 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 13 October 2009: Funds transferred to 1120998 THE SUSSEX HEART CHARITY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 30/06/2007 | 30/06/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £371.85k | £151.15k | £620.41k | £161.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £176.00k | £228.75k | £442.47k | £615.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £449.58k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £96.52k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £43.10k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £31.22k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £350.61k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £395.88k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.76k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | 12 October 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 27 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | 21 April 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 27 June 2008 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | 19 August 2008 | 111 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 04 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 08 September 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 30 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 30 September 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 JULY 1987, ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 17 AUGUST 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CARE, TREATMENT, RESUSCITATION AND REHABILITATION OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CARDIAC ATTACKS OR CONDITIONS (OR FORM ANY OTHER MEDICAL PROBLEMS) AND TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC EDUCATION, RESEARCH AND PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH IN RELATION THERETO.
Area of benefit
AREA COVERED BY THE BRIGHTON HEALTH AUTHORITY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window