THE OLIVE LAWRENCE MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 August 1987: Standard registration
- 11 November 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Jane Skinner | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Merlin Parish | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jason Evan McDonald | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANE OLIVIA PARISH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.36k | £0 | £12.50k | £0 | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.09k | £0 | £0 | £7.63k | £6.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 22 February 2025 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH MAY 1987
Charitable objects
TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. (FOR DETAIL, SEE CLAUSE 4 (1) OF TRUST DEED)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 ABBEYDALE PARK RISE
SHEFFIELD
S17 3PD
- Phone:
- 07788677699
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window