Minehead Gardening Club

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have a meeting once a month where we have guest speakers giving us talks on various garden subjects. We do not hold a meeting in August or December. We have a flower show once a year in August which is for the people of Minehead and surrounding towns - not just for the garden club members. There are various activities during the year, such as visits to gardens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Somerset
Governance
- 27 August 1987: Standard registration
- MINEHEAD GARDEN CLUB (Working name)
- MINEHEAD AND DISTRICT GARDENERS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Lawton | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Keith Paine | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Paine | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
GEOFF FULLER | Trustee | 18 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.18k | £1.26k | £618 | £4.92k | £5.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.92k | £1.04k | £769 | £4.39k | £4.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST MARCH 1986 AS AMENDED 29TH MARCH 1987 as amended on 08 Aug 2022 as amended on 29 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EUDCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE THEORY AND PRACTICE OF HORTICULTURE IN THE MINEHEAD AND DISTRICT AREA.
Area of benefit
MINEHEAD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Paganel Road
MINEHEAD
TA24 5EX
- Phone:
- 01643706558
- Email:
- minehead.gardeners@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window