THE FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S - TAWSTOCK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, or assist in,for the benefit of the public, the preservation, repair, maintenance, restoration, improvement and ornamentation of the fabric of the Church of Saint Peter, Tawstock, Devon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 16 November 1987: Standard registration
- 09 October 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- 08 June 2021: Re-registered
- THE FRIENDS OF SAINT PETERS TAWSTOCK (Working name)
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Kempton | Chair | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev Gary Owen | Trustee | 09 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Kenneth William Jennings | Trustee | 22 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANDREW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAYMOND FORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID SMALLRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £505 | £500 | £13.79k | £6.33k | £16.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56 | £30.03k | £30 | £11.44k | £7.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 February 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH APRIL 1987 AND AMENDED 8TH JULY 1987, AMENDED 16 AUGUST 1998
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENAMCE, RESTORATION, IMPROVEMENT AND ORNAMENTATION OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST PETER'S - TAWSTOCK AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF ARTICLES FOR USE IN WORSHIP THERE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TAWSTOCK
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Dunlin Drive
Yelland
Barnstaple
BARNSTAPLE
EX31 3TX
- Phone:
- 01271624572
- Email:
- georgekempton1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window