Financial history KINGSTON CHAMBER ORCHESTRA

Charity Number: 297541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £6.28k £5.49k £9.32k £12.14k £12.45k
Total expenditure £5.94k £3.03k £9.54k £10.99k £13.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A