MANNINGTREE MUSEUM AND LOCAL HISTORY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity manage the museum in Manningtree which is open to the general public, runs meetings and exhibitions to educate on the local history. The museum also organises history walks for schools, local groups and foreign school children. Maintains a large archive of local photographs and publication and family history information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 September 1987: Standard registration
- MANNINGTREE MUSEUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Bohannan | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Bodin | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Mark Cunningham | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Robert Gooding | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
IRENE WARNER | Trustee | 24 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.27k | £27.25k | £2.62k | £1.11k | £2.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.63k | £1.68k | £1.85k | £6.94k | £3.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH MAY 1987
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF MISTLEY, MANNINGTREE AND LAWFORD AND IN PARTICULAR TO ESTABLISH A MUSEUM FOR THE COLLECTION AND DISPLAY OF ITEMS, ESPECIALLY THOSE WHICH ARE RELEVANT TO THE HISTORY OF THE DISTRICT. B) TO ENCOURAGE AND STIMULATE INTEREST IN THE STUDY OF LOCAL HISTORY. C) TO PURSUE THESE ENDS BY MEANS OF MEETINGS, EXHIBITIONS AND OTHER FORMS OF PUBLICITY. D) TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS SHALL FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE GROUP.
Area of benefit
MISTLEY MANNINGTREE LAWFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Essex Arms
The Park
Manningtree
CO11 2AN
- Phone:
- 01206393737
- Website:
-
manningtree-museum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window