ROOKERY MEDICAL CENTRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To continue to support and improve the services we offer our patients by either purchasing and updating medical equipment or by improving the quality of care provided. In order to achieve the latter we have sent our nursing staff on certain, approved training days or courses to improve medical knowledge and skills employed in day to day care of patients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
- Suffolk
Governance
- 27 August 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY CHARLES TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr JANE MARGARET HORSNELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr MALINI WACE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.38k | £8.02k | £2.31k | £2.90k | £2.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £800 | £47.34k | £3.41k | £0 | £23.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST JULY 1987
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND PROVIDED AS AFORESAID THE TRUST SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING ANCILLARY OBJECTS NAMELY TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT (A) THE PROVISION OF DIAGNOSTIC AND OTHER MEDICAL FACILITIES AT THE ROOKERY MEDICAL CENTRE AND (B) OTHER LOCAL CHARITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROOKERY MEDICAL CENTRE
ROOKERY HOUSE
THE ROOKERY
NEWMARKET
CB8 8NW
- Phone:
- 01638665711
- Email:
- scott.burley@nhs.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window