Financial history THE BUDE HAVEN RECREATION GROUND LTD

Charity number: 297633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £77.73k £70.37k £143.81k £115.50k £119.82k
Total expenditure £72.08k £67.91k £75.71k £90.97k £95.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.54k £18.86k N/A N/A