Accounts and annual returns SHREWSBURY LODGE SCHOOL TRUST

Charity Number: 297656
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 11 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 28 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2014 22 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not Required