Abortion Talk

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide tailored support for people affected by abortion stigma via a free helpline. Provide and signpost online resources which challenge abortion stigma in society and offer information and support. Deliver provider support workshops for professionals involved in abortion care. Deliver values clarification training to healthcare professionals and others to explore values around abortion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
43 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 September 1987: Standard registration
- WOMANSCHOICE (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Jane Russell | Chair | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mara Clarke | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Chung | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Timbrell | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Hannah Brearley | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Yosef | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Zoe Georgina Macalpine | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Fisher | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hayley Webb | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £27.74k | £25.44k | £40.29k | £70.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £25.49k | £14.47k | £32.33k | £45.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 23 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 23 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 August 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2ND AUGUST 1987 as amended on 14 Oct 2020 as amended on 04 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION CONCERNING PREGNANCY CHILDBIRTH AND CHILD BEARING PARTICULARLY EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, TO PROMOTE RESEARCH CONCERNING ANY ASPECT OF THE SAME, AND TO PROMOTE (DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY) THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL CARE TREATMENT AND SERVICES RELATED TO THE FOREGOING OBJECTS (OR ANY OF THEM).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crown House
27 Old Gloucester St
London
WC1N 3AX
- Phone:
- 0207 336 0527
- Email:
- info@abortiontalk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window