HAMPSHIRE COUNTY YOUTH BAND ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the activities of the Hampshire County Youth Bands
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Hampshire
Governance
- 12 October 1987: Standard registration
- HYCBA (Working name)
- HAMPSHIRE YOUTH CONCERT BANDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE HAMPSHIRE COUNTY YOUTH BAND ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIE DAWN WILDS | Chair | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter Fenwick | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Howell | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Davage | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Shepherd | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILDS | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ISHBEL ANN SAWYER | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MICHAEL SMITH | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JENDEN WICKS | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN JANE BOYLES | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.36k | £295 | £8.82k | £7.69k | £7.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.16k | £4.14k | £5.91k | £25.60k | £15.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH APRIL 1987, AMENDED 7TH NOVEMBER 1992, 15TH OF OCTOBER 1994 AND 9 NOVEMBER 1996 AND 22 NOVEMBER 2003. AS AMENDED ON 13 OCT 2007 AS AMENDED ON 19 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF THE MEMBERS OF THE HAMPSHIRE COUNTY YOUTH BAND, THE HAMPSHIRE COUNTY YOUTH TRAINING BAND, THE HAMPSHIRE COUNTY YOUTH JUNIOR BAND AND THE HAMPSHIRE COUNTY YOUTH BANDS ENDANGERED SPECIES PROJECT BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THEIR MUSICAL EDUCATION IN ADDITION TO THOSE PROVIDED BY HAMPSHIRE MUSIC SERVICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 ELLIOT RISE
HEDGE END
SOUTHAMPTON
SO30 2RU
- Phone:
- 07754000184
- Email:
- HCYBA@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window