Accounts and annual returns FENLAND AND WEST NORFOLK AIRCRAFT PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 297713
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2022 08 December 2023 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 07 October 2022 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 14 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 25 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required