FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH PARIS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of St Michael's exists to support St Michael's Anglican Church, Paris. It provides an easy and tax-efficient vehicle for former members of the congregation and other supporters who live in the UK to financially support the activities of the church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- France
Governance
- 06 October 1987: Standard registration
- 23 July 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL'S (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL'S PARIS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.68k | £1.74k | £733 | £1.11k | £839 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.18k | £2.13k | £848 | £1.11k | £839 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 14 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 11 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 04 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 20TH JUNE 1987
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND FRANCE AND ELSEWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL BASIS SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "THE DOCTRINAL BASIS) AND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN EVANGELICAL FAITH IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE ASSOCIATION SHALL THINK FIT INCLUDING THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window