Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF IVER SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 297744
Charity reporting is up to date (120 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 October 2024 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 July 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 July 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 September 2020 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required