Trustees FRIENDS OF THE CENTRE FOR YOUNG MUSICIANS (FCYM)
Charity number: 297745

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Gayani Fernando | Chair | 04 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Chimduwem | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Choy Yin Chow | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Centre for Young Musicians | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Robinson | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tomaso Springardi | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
LAURENCE MARKANTONIS | Trustee | 30 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.