THANET PHOBIC GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity holds monthly fund raising coffee mornings/afternoons/evenings for members, friends and family. We provide to our members with monthly magazine which contains current information for our group, members letters, poems, articles etc.. We provide a free helpline which is available to our members and carers who need advise, help and support during difficult times.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 October 1987: Standard registration
- 23 February 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.10k | £3.05k | £2.48k | £3.08k | £3.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.25k | £1.39k | £2.91k | £2.90k | £2.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 31 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 11 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION - ADOPTED 24TH JUNE 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF PHOBIC SUFFERERS.
Area of benefit
THANET AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window