Trustees THE HORHAM AND ATHELINGTON COMMUNITY COUNCIL
Charity number: 297763
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS M H STREETER | Chair |
|
||||||
Maryann Cartwright | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|||||
John Wilson | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hambling | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Neil Douglas Cartwright | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Mr Steven Havers | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Rodney Tyrrell | Trustee | 22 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR Tim Debenham | Trustee | 22 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Karen Alderton | Trustee | 22 September 2014 |
|
|||||
HAV WILKINS | Trustee | 25 August 2011 |
|
|||||
MR D WHATLING | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR D MOYES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS W MOYES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS A S WILKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.