LOWENDER PERAN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal object and activity of the charitable company continues to be to promote the traditional culture of Cornwall and its celtic links. 2008 marked the 30th anniversary of the festival and provided an opportunity to review and re-brand our image with a new layout for the programme taking advantage of the intrinsically photogenic nature of the festival. We also brought on board two new dir
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income includes £15,381 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 09 November 1987: Standard registration
- 06 June 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- LOWENDER PERAN CELTIC FESTIVAL (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.39k | £23.08k | £130 | £2.69k | £27.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.21k | £20.96k | £2.25k | £2.71k | £26.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.34k | £6.75k | N/A | N/A | £15.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH AUGUST 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION ABOUT AND REVIVE THE TRADITIONAL CULTURE OF CORNWALL, AND ITS CELTIC LINKS.
Area of benefit
CORNWALL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window