HELP THE CHILD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help the Child raises funds through a number of events throughout the year, with the purpose of providing items of specialist equipment and educational toys for children with special educational needs, physical disability or sensory impairment within Somerset.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 January 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Somerset
Governance
- 23 November 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annette Stimpson | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Margaret Thomas | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Alexandra Allen | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jane Webber | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sally Gordon Holl | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Daphne Blackshaw | Trustee | 29 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Katherine Godfrey | Trustee | 29 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Ann Gough | Trustee | 06 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Carol Anne Hicks | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN JANE BRENNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Nicola Gail Sucksmith | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Stephanie June Sampson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLA ROSE WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/01/2020 | 02/01/2021 | 02/01/2022 | 02/01/2023 | 02/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.19k | £19.47k | £14.07k | £12.41k | £24.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.67k | £13.84k | £15.58k | £9.92k | £21.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 January 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 January 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 January 2022 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 January 2021 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 January 2020 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF MENTALLY AND PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN RESIDENT IN SOMERSET AND AVON BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN PROVIDING AIDS CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE SICKNESS SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF SUCH CHILDREN
Area of benefit
SOMERSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
CROSSWAYS
GORE ROAD
BURNHAM-ON-SEA
TA8 2HL
- Phone:
- 01278792555
- Email:
- admin@helpthechild.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window