Trustees HELP THE CHILD
Charity number: 297790

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annette Stimpson | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Margaret Thomas | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Alexandra Allen | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jane Webber | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sally Gordon Holl | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Daphne Blackshaw | Trustee | 29 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Katherine Godfrey | Trustee | 29 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Ann Gough | Trustee | 06 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Carol Anne Hicks | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN JANE BRENNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Nicola Gail Sucksmith | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Stephanie June Sampson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLA ROSE WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.