Accounts and annual returns THE PJK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 297794
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 19 November 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 20 December 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2016 15 March 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 03 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2015 19 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 23 November 2015 On Time