THE GRACE COOK TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poor, aged, sick or infirm persons resident or living in the Parish of Slip End in Bedfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 12 November 1987: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVE KINGSTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sarah Louise Minnighan | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN MARK COLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206 | £256 | £265 | £104 | £60 | |
|
Total expenditure | £278 | £666 | £247 | £154 | £290 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 June 2023 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 March 2022 | 275 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25TH SEPTEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE POOR, AGED, SICK OR INFIRM LIVING IN THE PARISH OF SLIP END, IN THE COUNTY OF BEDFORD OR PERSONS SUITABLY QUALIFIED WHO ARE RESIDENTS IN THE NEIGHBOURING PARISHES.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF SLIP END
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 CRAWLEY CLOSE
SLIP END
LUTON
LU1 4BT
- Phone:
- 01582416138
- Email:
- grace.cook@askaccounts.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window