Governing document THE DE VERE SOCIETY
Charity number: 297855

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAR 2022 as amended on 14 Apr 2023 as amended on 23 Mar 2024 as amended on 23 Mar 2024 as amended on 23 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE SOCIETY EXISTS TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF THE LIFE AND WORKS OF SHAKESPEARE WITH THE PARTICULAR GOAL OF ESTABLISHING AND PRESENTING OBJECTIVE EVIDENCE THAT EDWARD DE VERE, 17TH EARL OF OXFORD WAS THE AUTHOR USING THE PSEUDONYM WILLIAM SHAKESPEARE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.