AYLESBURY FESTIVAL CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide regular opportunities for all singers to perform music from a wide choral repertoire. Provide and sustain a cultural asset for Aylesbury and the surrounding area. Foster children's knowledge and love of choral music by including them in concerts where appropriate. Secure financial support to enable the choir to expand it's repertoire and to improve its standards of performance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 30 November 1987: Standard registration
- DECEMBER FESTIVAL CHOIR (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MICHAEL ELLIOTT | Chair | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE ATHERTON | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Page | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA AYLETT | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA PHIPPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.63k | £10.19k | £2.76k | £19.59k | £13.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.15k | £10.68k | £6.77k | £16.73k | £18.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 07 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHOIR SHALL BE TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF , THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS, BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS, AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE CHOIR, THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE, SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ringwood
Kiln Road
Prestwood
GREAT MISSENDEN
Buckinghamshire
HP16 9DH
- Phone:
- 07801033077
- Email:
- nltw@globalnet.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window