ALDER BRIDGE ASSOCIATION FOR STEINER-WALDORF EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Alder Bridge Associaition for Steiner-Waldorf Education provides schooling, kindergartens and Parent & Child groups based upon Rudolf Steiner's teaching to educate the whole child.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 12 November 1987: Standard registration
- ALDER BRIDGE ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- ALDER BRIDGE SCHOOL (Working name)
- CHRISTCHURCH GARDENS KINDERGARTEN (Working name)
- READING STEINER SCHOOL PROJECT (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL JENKINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Bimal Dharsi | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Sean O'Sullivan Iveson | Trustee | 07 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £372.41k | £439.74k | £415.23k | £420.81k | £324.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £382.07k | £404.96k | £442.41k | £411.79k | £385.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £15.00k | £14.31k | £15.18k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH AUGUST 1987, AMENDED 8 FEBRUARY 1999, AMENDED 27 APRIL 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION UPON THE PRINCIPLES INDICATED BY THE LATE DR RUDOLF STEINER AND TO CONDUCT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ANY BOARDING OR DAY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN. (FOR DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION.)
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRIDGE HOUSE
MILL LANE
PADWORTH
READING
RG7 4JU
- Phone:
- 01189714471
- Email:
- info@alderbridge.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window