Trustees DEVORAN QUAY PRESERVATION SOCIETY
Charity number: 297861
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN HILL MORSE | Chair | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JAMES CHARNLEY | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
SALLY HARBER | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN TYSON | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
TRISTAN NEAL ELLIOT JONES | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN FREDERICK STAMFORD | Trustee | 02 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
BENITA TOON | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE DENNISON | Trustee | 23 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JAMES IAN WRIGLEY | Trustee | 23 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN FERRIS | Trustee | 01 January 2005 |
|
|
||||
PAUL STEPHEN PRICE HAINS | Trustee | 01 January 2005 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.