Accounts and annual returns LAXFIELD PRE-SCHOOL GROUP

Charity number: 297896
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 04 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 27 November 2017 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2016 16 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 16 December 2016 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2015 03 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2015 09 December 2015 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2014 16 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2014 18 December 2014 On Time