THE COOKS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the education and the general welfare of persons who are in any way associated with the catering trade and the support of any charitable purpose connected with the City of London
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 November 1987: Standard registration
- "THE COOKS" CHARITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Vivian Budd OBE | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Fooks | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
COMMODORE DAVID ANDREW HARRY MCGREGOR SMITH CBE | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Andrew Philip Wright | Trustee | 13 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Oliver HW Goodinge | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £286.38k | £269.98k | £305.77k | £292.86k | £277.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £268.39k | £298.59k | £230.78k | £236.78k | £239.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 May 2022 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15TH OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 15 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION AND THE GENERAL WELFARE OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN ANY WAY ASSOCIATED WITH THE CATERING TRADE. THE SUPPORT OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE CONNECTED WITH THE CITY OF LONDON
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Rock Lane
WARMINSTER
Wiltshire
BA12 9JZ
- Phone:
- 07518 138883
- Email:
- clerk@cookslivery.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window