PEPPER POT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide facilities in social welfare, health & wellbeing, recreation,leisure with object of improving conditions of life,combating isolation, relieving needs of older people over 50,particularly African, Caribbean and other BME groups living in Kensington & Chelsea, surrounding boroughs and offer care services to those suffering physically.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £167,828 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brent
- City Of Westminster
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 16 December 1987: Standard registration
- PEPPER POT CLUB (Previous name)
- PEPPER POT DAY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Davis | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mervin Archer | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Metzger | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carmen Rose | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Nobrega | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ferdinand Maxwell | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jules Walter | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANNE MILLS | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|||||
HOWARD JEFFREY | Trustee | 21 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
HAROLD ROACH | Trustee | 24 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £187.51k | £199.29k | £205.80k | £146.87k | £282.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £214.22k | £212.09k | £241.77k | £217.33k | £279.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £111.00k | £137.81k | £130.16k | £117.83k | £167.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 12 OCTOBER 2005, 23 NOVEMBER 2009 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATION AND LEISURE OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF OLDER PEOPLE AGED 50 OR OVER, PARTICULARLY THOSE OF AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN ORIGIN LIVING IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KENSINGTON & CHELSEA AND THE SURROUNDING BOROUGHS, AS WELL AS TO OFFER CARE AND ASSISTANCE TO THOSE SUFFERING FROM PHYSICAL AND MENTAL DISABILITIES.
Area of benefit
NORTH KENSINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A THORPE CLOSE
LADBROKE GROVE
LONDON
W10 5XL
- Phone:
- 02089686940
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window