Redbourn Community Group

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing transport and assistance to Redbourn residents who need a helping hand, mainly (but not exclusively) the sick and elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £19,790 from 12 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
153 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 12 November 1987: Standard registration
- REDBOURN CARE GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Charles Lothian Wheen | Chair | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Trevor Mason | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Hill | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
SIMONE DEANS | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Regan | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Philip Miller | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catharine Anne Veronica Pusey | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.62k | £49.19k | £128.98k | £184.44k | £72.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.58k | £38.17k | £50.34k | £62.24k | £57.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.43k | £12.25k | £16.00k | £20.66k | £19.79k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2020
(These accounts |
06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 03 August 2020 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD SEPTEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED 29 OCTOBER 2009 AS AMENDED ON 18 OCT 2018 as amended on 15 Oct 2020 as amended on 02 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMNUITY IN THE PARISH OF REDBOURN AND ITS ENVIRONS, IN PARTICULAR, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF REDBOURN AND ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Redbourn Village Hall
63 High Street
Redbourn
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL3 7LW
- Phone:
- 01582794550
- Email:
- info@redbourncg.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window