ST MARY'S LODGE NO 3828 CHARITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 297974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes grants to organisations

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 November 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Charles Bloomfield Trustee 25 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £33 £33 £1 £0
Total expenditure £0 £3.00k £3.00k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 November 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 January 2022 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 November 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
18 KENNEL LOKE
GORLESTON
GREAT YARMOUTH
NR31 6JU
Phone:
01493661075
Website:

No information available