THE ROEHAMPTON PARISH CHURCH RESTORATION FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ARE THE FABRIC AND BUILDING MAINTENANCE FUND FOR HOLY TRINITY PARISH CHURCH, ROEHAMPTON
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 25 November 1987: Standard registration
- 05 February 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £817 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4TH OCTOBER 1987
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE CHURCH AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED (IN PRACTICE ROEHAMPTON)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window