THE DELFONT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General support of both small and large worthy organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 February 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Sykes | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARY CONNOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER MORSE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.97k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.46k | £179.98k | £6.07k | £25 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 January 2023 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 January 2022 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 November 2020 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 2ND NOVEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
IN FURTHERANCE AND PURSUANCE OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 ASHBURNHAM ROAD
EASTBOURNE
BN21 2HU
- Phone:
- 01323645820
- Email:
- jsykes@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window