THE FRIENDS OF PINNER PARISH CHURCH, ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, PINNER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity encourages all who are interested in the building from either an historic or architectural point of view to join those who are concerned in preserving an important place of worship and centre of community life in Pinner. The Church, dedicated in 1321, is undergoing extensive restoration and donations are sought from a wider public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Harrow
Governance
- 17 November 1987: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF PINNER PARISH CHURCH (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Mary Lawson | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Mary WHITE | Trustee | 14 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Katherine Adey | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Anthony Jeffrey Hooper | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Sabry-Grant | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ANN BRAMPTON | Trustee | 25 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS JENNIE YOULE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.34k | £18.68k | £25.63k | £4.35k | £11.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.53k | £683 | £564 | £10.48k | £495 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION, ADOPTED 27 SEPTEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO HELP PRESERVE AND IMPROVE THE FABRIC, BUILDINGS AND PRECINCTS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, PINNER, AND ITS ADJOINING PROPERTY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST PINNER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pinner Parish Church
Church Lane
PINNER
Middlesex
HA5 3AA
- Phone:
- 02088663475
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window