THE BRITISH FIRE SERVICES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage best practice and theoretical instruction and practical application of fire prevention, fire safety, extinction and first aid to the injured. Providing a central organisation for fire and rescue services and generally to do things as may from time to time be necessary to elevate the status of the wider service for the benefit of the community at large.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 March 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Seamus Higgins | Chair | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Veitch | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Thomas Woodhouse | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Owen-Hughes MBE | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Watson | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Basson | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matt Stokes | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD LOVELACE | Trustee | 05 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAM LOWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR STEVE SHIRLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
FRANK TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TONY BARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFF MCSWEENEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.38k | £10.51k | £22.40k | £22.40k | £21.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.96k | £17.66k | £20.89k | £20.89k | £18.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH APRIL 1912 AS AMENDED 7TH SEPTEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE THE THEORETICAL INSTRUCTION AND PRACTICAL APPLICATION OF FIRE PREVENTION, EXTINCTION AND FIRST AID TO THE INJURED BY PROVIDING A CENTRAL ORGANISATION FOR FIRE BRIGADES AND SALVAGE CORPORATIONS, AND GERNERALLY TO DO ALL SUCH THINGS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE NECESSARY TO ELEVATE THE STATUS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE FINANCE CENTRE
34A SOUTHGATE
SLEAFORD
LINCOLNSHIRE
NG34 7RY
- Phone:
- 07745585082
- Email:
- generalsecretary@bfsa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window