Financial history JUBILEE HOUSE CARE TRUST LTD

Charity number: 298074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.27m £2.55m £2.76m £3.41m £3.84m
Total expenditure £2.28m £2.53m £2.72m £3.55m £3.98m
Income from government contracts £2.12m £2.46m N/A £2.96m £2.83m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.92k
Income - Donations and legacies £46.47k £48.77k £32.70k £92.25k £22.14k
Income - Other trading activities £572 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.22m £2.46m £2.73m £3.32m £3.80m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.74k £3.16k £1.84k £6.71k £16.20k
Income - Other £0 £37.08k £2.90k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.27m £2.52m £2.72m £3.54m £3.96m
Expenditure - Raising funds £14.05k £2.93k £200 £11.30k £19.97k
Expenditure - Governance £11.99k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0