BUGATTI MOLSHEIM LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education for the benefit of the community by the establishment and running of a study centre with exhibition facilities devoted to the history and technical importance of Ettore Bugatti and cars and other products which he created.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 December 1987: Standard registration
- THE BUGATTI TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allan Rippon | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Adams-Diffey | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Day | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER LEITH | Trustee | 04 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES DEAN | Trustee | 04 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
SIR JOHN LLEWELYN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL STEPHEN PAUL PRESTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAJOR AMYAS CHARLES TREVELYAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.01k | £134.54k | £239.25k | £239.84k | £258.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £410.39k | £113.93k | £164.94k | £206.63k | £238.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED 22 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND RUNNING OF A MUSEUM AND RESEARCH CENTRE DEVOTED TO THE HISTORY AND TECHNICAL IMPORTANCE OF ETTORE BUGATTI AND CARS AND OTHER PRODUCTS WHICH HE CREATED: AND (B) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Smithy Stocktons Courtyard
Overbury
TEWKESBURY
Gloucestershire
GL20 7NT
- Phone:
- 01242224886
- Email:
- info@bugatti-trust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window