THE HENRY DOUBLEDAY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Garden Organic promotes organic gardening. Our focus is on individual, community and school gardens throughout the UK. We use innovative practices to inspire and encourage people to grow organically. We collaborate with others to achieve the greatest impact.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,052,790
Donations and legacies | £1.67m | |
Charitable activities | £305.87k | |
Other trading activities | £43.26k | |
Investments | £21.34k | |
Other | £8.47k |
Total expenditure:
£2,089,669
Raising funds | £726.24k | |
Charitable activities | £1.36m | |
Other | £0 |
£66,032 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £187,189 from 16 government contract(s) and £36,645 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £726.24k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.36m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £726.24k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.36m | |
Retained for future use | £29.15k |
People

40 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
617 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 January 1988: Standard registration
- GARDEN ORGANIC (Working name)
- HDRA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Bond | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Bosher | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Varney | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nadia Mazza | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Robinson | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Sara Dawson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gordon Mitchell | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Louise Taylor | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Wright | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joylon Thorpe McIndoe | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Arrowsmith | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.01m | £1.74m | £1.72m | £1.47m | £2.05m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.05m | £1.83m | £1.80m | £1.89m | £2.09m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £233.63k | £152.57k | £100.88k | £173.95k | £187.19k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £18.98k | £58.46k | £36.65k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.22m | £1.24m | £1.42m | £1.02m | £1.67m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £161.54k | £97.01k | £72.51k | £60.75k | £43.26k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £590.29k | £358.95k | £209.93k | £354.03k | £305.87k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.14k | £8.65k | £22.12k | £23.26k | £21.34k | |
|
Income - Other | £35.10k | £36.66k | £3.30k | £10.47k | £8.47k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £395.14k | £296.25k | £511.76k | £200.16k | £827.58k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.41m | £1.17m | £1.06m | £1.25m | £1.36m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £645.71k | £654.46k | £737.65k | £641.05k | £726.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £25.05k | £29.95k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £22.68k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.00k | £119.57k | £109.51k | £169.44k | £128.30k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £1.38m | £1.53m | £941.80k | £690.73k | |
|
Other assets | £2.48m | £640.87k | £517.53k | £283.26k | £482.66k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.89m | -£2.10m | -£862.00k | -£804.31k | -£737.82k | |
|
Total liabilities | £437.24k | £437.32k | £426.22k | £416.95k | £361.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 December 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 December 2023 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/11/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/01/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/10/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 SEP 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND SCIENCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: THE IMPROVEMENT OF SCIENTIFIC AND PRACTICAL HORTICULTURE AND AGRICULTURE IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES THROUGH THE APPLICATION OF ORGANIC METHODS AND PRINCIPLES. RESEARCH INTO AND THE STUDY OF ORGANIC METHODS AND PRINCIPLES OF HORTICULTURE AND AGRICULTURE AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF. THE ADVANCEMENT OF AWARENESS AND KNOWLEDGE OF ECOSYSTEMS AND OUR IMPACT ON THEM BY DEMONSTRATING THE VALUE OF ORGANIC METHODS ON A BROAD EDUCATIONAL FRONT BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE COMPANY'S PROPERTY AT RYTON GARDENS (AND/OR SUCH OTHER PROPERTIES AS THE COMPANY MAY MANAGE OR ACQUIRE) AND THE CONSERVATION OF WILDLIFE THEREON AS A CENTRE OR CENTRES FOR SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH INTO THE PRACTICAL APPLICATION OF ORGANIC METHODS OF AGRICULTURE AND HORTICULTURE AND THEIR INFLUENCE ON THE WILDLIFE USING THE PROPERTY AS THEIR NATURAL HABITAT AND TO MAKE THE SAME AVAILABLE FOR INSPECTION AND STUDY BY MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONALLY
Contact information
- Address:
-
GARDEN ORGANIC
RYTON ORGANIC GARDENS
WOLSTON LANE
RYTON ON DUNSMORE
COVENTRY
CV8 3LG
- Phone:
- 02476303517
- Email:
- enquiry@gardenorganic.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window