Trustees THE HENRY DOUBLEDAY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 298104

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Bond | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Bosher | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Varney | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nadia Mazza | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Robinson | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Sara Dawson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gordon Mitchell | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Louise Taylor | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Wright | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joylon Thorpe McIndoe | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Arrowsmith | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.