GATWICK TRAVEL-CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gatwick TravelCare assists over 2000 passengers a year with travel related problems. These cover a wide range of issues including financial difficulties, missed flights, passport irregularities and mental health. The team of staff and volunteers also works with airlines, handling agents, consulates, embassies, social services and the police to provide passengers with the best possible service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- West Sussex
Governance
- 18 December 1987: Standard registration
- 09 October 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 February 2011: Standard registration
- 18 April 2023: Funds received from 1078466 SAMM SOUTH EAST ( THE GATWICK GROUP )
- GATWICK TRAVEL-CARE UNIT (Previous name)
- GATWICK TRAVEL-CARE UNITE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lauren McDaniel | Chair | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Edwards | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek Hearsey | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ann Wilcox | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsay Siantonas | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Comber | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Annette Ayres | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.10k | £73.04k | £47.73k | £76.63k | £87.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.86k | £65.92k | £43.92k | £63.71k | £77.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £40.50k | £27.00k | £27.00k | £20.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.00k | £27.48k | £4.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH OCTOBER 1987 as amended on 01 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS TRAVELLING THROUGH GATWICK AIRPORT, GATWICK, WEST SUSSEX, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WHOSE PROBLEMS ARE OUTSIDE THE SCOPE OF THE NORMAL SERVICES PROVIDED BY THE AIRPORTS AUTHORITY, AIRLINES, FIRMS AND CONTROL AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
GATWICK AIRPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gatwick Travel-Care
Room 3014B
South Terminal
GATWICK AIRPORT
West Sussex
RH6 0NP
- Phone:
- 01293 504283
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window