Financial history THE ALDENHAM FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 298140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £17.86m £16.99m £20.23m £22.41m £23.25m
Total expenditure £17.04m £17.39m £19.30m £21.29m £23.07m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £107.80k £97.28k £240.40k £109.77k £157.31k
Income - Other trading activities £134.43k £60.77k £192.51k £342.69k £335.24k
Income - Charitable activities £17.00m £16.70m £19.64m £21.63m £22.50m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.57k £128 £10 £14.36k £148.67k
Income - Other £607.41k £133.16k £154.60k £311.56k £100.30k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.87m £17.19m £18.98m £20.66m £22.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £168.70k £159.43k £213.76k £412.04k £495.58k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £172.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £38.37k £102.43k £221.23k £209.20k