THE PEACOCK FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A small charity trust aiming to make cash donations in line with its objectives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 December 1987: Standard registration
- 09 October 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115 | £120 | £120 | £120 | £120 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 24 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 26 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH FEBRUARY 1987 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 11TH JUNE 1987
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE TRUST FUND TO PAY OR APPLY THE ANNUAL INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND AS AND WHEN RECEIVED AND ALSO SO MUCH OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE FOR SUCH CHARITIES OR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER IN ALL RESPECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window