Governance CHOICE SUPPORT
Charity number: 298149
Removed charity
Registration history:
- 11 December 1987: Standard registration
- 12 July 2011: Funds received from 1081081 SIGNATURE CARE AND SUPPORT
- 07 April 2014: Funds received from 1056641 THE ROY KINNEAR CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
- 08 November 2018: Removed (Exempt charity)
- 27 June 2019: Funds received from 1015229 LADY VERDIN TRUST LIMITED
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- SOUTHWARK CONSORTIUM (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.