Governing document CHOICE SUPPORT
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/11/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 NOV 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE RELIEF OF NEED AND THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH PARTICULARLY FOR THOSE WHO HAVE LEARNING OR MENTAL HEALTH DISABILITIES OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OR OTHER HEALTH NEEDS OR WHO ARE OLD OR INFIRM OR HAVE NEEDS BECAUSE OF THEIR YOUTH, LACK OF EDUCATION, POVERTY OR THE MISUSE OF DRUGS OR ALCOHOL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEEDS
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS OF SOUTHWARK, LEWISHAM AND LAMBETH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.