MRS P A CLARK'S CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funds are distributed to support mainly local charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 December 1987: Standard registration
- 26 July 2010: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2007 | 05/04/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £673 | £672 | |
|
Total expenditure | £675 | £587 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | 17 February 2010 | 12 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | 04 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | 26 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF VARIATION DATED 13TH MARCH 1987
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES REGISTERED UNDER THE CHARITIES ACT 1960 (OR ANDY STATUTORY RE-ENACTMENT OR REPLACEMENT THEREOF FOR THE TIME BEING IN FORCE) AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DURING THE TRUST PERIOD THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window