Financial history THE HEART OF KENT HOSPICE

Charity Number: 298164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.43m £5.98m £6.42m £6.12m £6.93m
Total expenditure £4.98m £4.96m £5.49m £6.06m £6.60m
Income from government contracts £217.60k £246.73k £264.30k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.30m £2.37m £1.70m £1.13m £1.27m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.38m £2.21m £2.13m £3.56m £4.36m
Income - Other trading activities £2.47m £1.12m £1.92m £1.74m £1.94m
Income - Charitable activities £1.57m £2.65m £2.37m £775.19k £508.64k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.83k £607 £889 £43.06k £115.51k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.51k £1.25k
Income - Legacies £388.14k £655.26k £696.69k £763.04k £1.56m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.18m £3.47m £3.62m £3.92m £4.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.79m £1.50m £1.88m £2.14m £2.37m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £19.44k £102.69k £163.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £2.64k £0 £0 £0 £0