CRISIS COUNSELLING FOR ALLEGED SHOPLIFTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Counselling for Alleged Shoplifters
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 December 1987: Standard registration
- C C A S (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HARRY KAUFFER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Harvey Rose | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6 | £1 | £0 | £9 | £24 | |
|
Total expenditure | £300 | £200 | £250 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2025 | 373 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF THE ASSOCIATION ADOPTED 20TH JULY 1982 AND AMENDED 14TH JULY 1986
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF PERSONS ACCUSED OF SHOPLIFTING OFFENCES AND OF THE MEMBERS OF THE FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING AND ADVICE AND COUNSELLING SERVICE FOR SUCH INIVIDUALS AND BY REFERRING THEM IF NECESSARY TO A SOLICITOR SOCIAL WORKER OR OTHER QUALIFIED PERSON ABLE TO PROVIDE EXPERT PROFESSIONAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 147
STANMORE
MIDDLESEX
HA7 4PQ
- Phone:
- 02089548987
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window