HOFFMANN FOUNDATION FOR AUTISM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hoffmann Foundation for Autism provides individualised services which improve the lives of adults with autism spectrum conditions 1) Residential Units 2) Supported Living Services 3) Day Activities Centre 4) Behavioural Support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 January 1988: Standard registration
- 22 November 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- ALICE HOFFMANN HOMES LIMITED (Previous name)
- HOFFMANN DE VISME FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.89m | £2.74m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.87m | £4.20m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.24m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £496 | £1.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.24m | £1.13m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £101 | £1.61m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £642.15k | £268 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.79m | £4.20m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £78.43k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
23 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/09/1987 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/04/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/06/2004 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/08/2012 as amended on 16 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
RELIEVE THE NEED OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS WHO HAVE A RANGE OF MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS, LEARNING DISABILITIES OR COMMUNICATION DIFFICULTIES INCLUDING AUTISM AND ASPERGER'S SYNDROME, BY PROVIDING SUPPORTED LIVING ACCOMMODATION, DAY SERVICES AND SUPPORT IN THE COMMUNITY TO INCLUDE EDUCATION, LEISURE, WORK ACTIVITIES, COUNSELLING AND SOCIAL HOUSING.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window